OK SB690 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; brewer; distribution agreements; terms, definitions, successor business. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; brewer; distribution agreements; terms, definitions, successor business. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |