OK SB682 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB682
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Podiatric Medicine Practice Act; increasing required residency time. Effective date.
Title
Podiatric Medicine Practice Act; increasing required residency time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-13 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 12 |
2017-04-13 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Marlatt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB682 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017