OK SB68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB68
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; authorizing certain motorcycle special plate; modifying certain special plate; creating specified ABATE special plate. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; authorizing certain motorcycle special plate; modifying certain special plate; creating specified ABATE special plate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-10 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB68 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - HAs read
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1104 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1135 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |