OK SB673 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB673
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; statutory references. Effective date.
Title
Insurance; statutory references. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Downing [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/11/2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2017-04-05 | House | General Order |
2017-03-29 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2017-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Downing (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB673 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - Approved by Governor 04/11/2017