OK SB672 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; allowing certain transport. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; allowing certain transport. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Patzkowsky (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Murdock
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback