OK SB67 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher certification; allowing exceptions to required certification examinations for candidates who are deaf. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher certification; allowing exceptions to required certification examinations for candidates who are deaf. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2021-03-08HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-08SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-04SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-04SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2021-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-23Senatecoauthored by Lawson
2021-02-08SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Simpson
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb67&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB67%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB67%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB67%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB67%20HFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB67%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB67%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB67%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB67_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB67_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback