OK SB668 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
Pending: House Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws
Pending: House Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement boards; Oklahoma State Pension Commission; adding certain person; OPERS Board; adding certain person. Effective date. Emergency
Title
Retirement boards; Oklahoma State Pension Commission; adding certain person; OPERS Board; adding certain person. Effective date. Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Randy) (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Jolley |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |