OK SB665 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; relating to the Electrical License Act; modifying provisions relating to the application and construction of the Act. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; relating to the Electrical License Act; modifying provisions relating to the application and construction of the Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-21 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2009-05-21 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2009-05-18 | 2 CCR read | |
2009-05-14 | SCs changed Coates, Newberry, Myers, Leftwich to Coates, Brogdon, Myers, Leftwich | |
2009-05-14 | HC's added: Thompson | |
2009-05-14 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2009-05-13 | CCR rejected, further conference requested | |
2009-05-12 | coauthored by Jordan | |
2009-05-12 | remove as principal author Representative Jordan and substitute with Representative Thompson | |
2009-05-12 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-12 | Title restored | |
2009-05-12 | CCR read | |
2009-05-11 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Jordan | |
2009-05-11 | Pending removal principal author Representative Jordan and replace with Representative Thompson | |
2009-04-30 | SCs named Coates, Newberry, Myers, Leftwich | |
2009-04-30 | Conference granted, HC's named Jordan, Derby, Watson, McDaniel (Randy), Inman, Dorman, Sullivan | |
2009-04-22 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-14 | HAs read | |
2009-04-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 8 | |
2009-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott | |
2009-04-13 | General Order | |
2009-04-01 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-04-01 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2009-03-11 | First Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-10 | remove as principal author Representative Kirby and substitute with Representative Jordan | |
2009-03-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-26 | Pending removal principal author Representative Kirby and replace with Representative Jordan | |
2009-02-24 | coauthored by Kirby (principal House author) | |
2009-02-24 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-23 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Kirby | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Coates | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1000 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1692 | New Code | See Bill Text |