OK SB664 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
An act relating to school administration; modify certain percentages in foundation aid. Effective date.
Title
An act relating to school administration; modify certain percentages in foundation aid. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Corey Holland [R] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3; Ayes: 59 Nays: 32 | |
2011-04-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ritze | |
2011-04-25 | General Order | |
2011-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Title restored | |
2011-03-15 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-03-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-02-22 | coauthored by Holland (principal House author) | |
2011-02-22 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Fields | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |