OK SB66 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; creating exemption to surplus lines coverage for schools. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating exemption to surplus lines coverage for schools. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2021
2021-05-25SenateSent to Governor
2021-05-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-05-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-05-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-05-25HouseTo Senate
2021-05-25HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2021-05-25HouseCCR adopted
2021-05-19HouseCCR submitted
2021-05-19SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
2021-05-19SenateCCR adopted
2021-05-17SenateEnacting clause restored
2021-05-17SenateTitle restored
2021-05-17SenateCCR read
2021-05-06HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
2021-05-04SenateSCs named Haste, Quinn, Newhouse, Stanley, Matthews, Brooks
2021-04-27SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2021-04-13SenateHAs read
2021-04-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-04-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2021-04-12HouseEnacting clause stricken
2021-04-12HouseTitle stricken
2021-04-12HouseAmended
2021-04-12HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Insurance
2021-03-02HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-02SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-01SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-01SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2021-03-01SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-02-10SenateCoauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author)
2021-02-08SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Haste
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb66&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB66%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB66%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB66%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB66%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB66%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB66%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/SB66%20FA1%20HILBERTKY-TT.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB66%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB66%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB66%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB66%20CCR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB66%20CCR%20&%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB66_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB66_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback