OK SB658 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB658

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Medicaid Program; broading scope of certain analysis by Health Care Authority. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Medicaid Program; broading scope of certain analysis by Health Care Authority. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-22SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-20SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-20SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Allen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB658 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - Title stricken

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback