OK SB657 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB657
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health providers; creating the Protection Against Sexual Exploitation By a Mental Health Service Provider Act. Effective date.
Title
Mental health providers; creating the Protection Against Sexual Exploitation By a Mental Health Service Provider Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Died in conference |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2017-05-10 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2017-04-19 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-18 | House | Amended |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB657 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 14 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 14 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |