OK SB656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB656
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement education; requiring the Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training to include mental health training in curriculum. Effective date.
Title
Law enforcement education; requiring the Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training to include mental health training in curriculum. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 5 |
2019-04-17 | House | General Order |
2019-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB656 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019