OK SB656 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB656
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Treat
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Treat
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Athlete agents; creating the Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act of 2015. Effective date.
Title
Athlete agents; creating the Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act of 2015. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Treat [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Holt; authored by Senator Treat |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holt |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB656 (Carry Over) 2017-02-20 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 821 | 81 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 82 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 83 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 84 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 85 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 86 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 87 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 88 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 821 | 89 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |