OK SB648 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Highways; modifying maximum speed limits for the turnpike and interstate system. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Highways; modifying maximum speed limits for the turnpike and interstate system. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Silk |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB648 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)