OK SB647 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Signed, returned to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Childbirth; creating "Lily's Law"; providing definitions. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Childbirth; creating "Lily's Law"; providing definitions. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2021-04-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
2021-04-14HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-30HouseCR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2021-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6
2021-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-01SenateCoauthored by Representative Stark (principal House author)
2021-02-22SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb647&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB647%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB647%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB647%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB647%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB647%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB647%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB647%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB647%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB647%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB647_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB647_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback