OK SB642 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion; requiring physicians to preserve fetal tissue in certain circumstances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion; requiring physicians to preserve fetal tissue in certain circumstances. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22HouseTo Senate
2015-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 5
2015-05-22HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Newberry, Sharp
2015-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5
2015-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-20SenateEnacting clause restored
2015-05-20SenateTitle restored
2015-05-20SenateCCR read
2015-05-19Senatecoauthored by Ritze
2015-05-05HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
2015-04-28SenateSCs named Treat, Standridge, David, Griffin, Allen, Garrison, Pittman
2015-04-21SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-21SenateHAs read
2015-04-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 8
2015-04-20HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-02HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Shortey
2015-04-02HouseEnacting clause stricken
2015-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Health Committee
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2015-03-04HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-04SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-03SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-03SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5
2015-03-03SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-02-23SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2015-02-11Senatecoauthored by Grau (principal House author)
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Treat
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
631740New CodeSee Bill Text
631749Amended CodeSee Bill Text
631750Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb642&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB642%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB642%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB642%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB642%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB642%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB642%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB642%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB642%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB642_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB642_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback