OK SB630 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; providing for intensive remediation of students with certain scores on reading assessments. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; providing for intensive remediation of students with certain scores on reading assessments. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03SenateApproved by Governor 06/03/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22HouseTo Senate
2015-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 7
2015-05-22HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Jolley
2015-05-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Inman, Condit
2015-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2015-05-22SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2015-05-21SenateEmergency added
2015-05-21SenateEnacting clause restored
2015-05-21SenateTitle restored
2015-05-21SenateCCR read, GCCA
2015-05-11HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
2015-04-29SenateSCs named GCCA
2015-04-27SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-22Senatecoauthored by Sharp
2015-04-22SenateHAs read
2015-04-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
2015-04-21HouseGeneral Order
2015-03-25HouseEnacting clause stricken
2015-03-25HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Common Education Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2015-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-03-09Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2015-03-03Senatecoauthored by Casey (principal House author)
2015-02-25SenateEmergency clause stricken
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-16Senatecoauthored by Mazzei
2015-02-16SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-02-16SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Ford
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701210508CNew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb630&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB630%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB630%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB630%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB630%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB630%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB630%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB630%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB630_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB630_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback