OK SB63 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB63
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; background check procedures. Effective date.
Title
Firearms; background check procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | coauthored by Representative Cleveland (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Carry Over) 2017-03-01 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1290 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1290 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb63&Session=1700 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB63%20INT.PDF |