OK SB622 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB622
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Enacting clause restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; making Service Oklahoma a separate and distinct agency. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; making Service Oklahoma a separate and distinct agency. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE AND ENACTING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Aeronautics & Transportation: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-15 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2023-05-11 | Senate | SCs named Hall, Haste, Alvord, Rosino, Matthews, Seifried, Rogers |
2023-05-02 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2023-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2023-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 7 |
2023-04-26 | House | General Order |
2023-04-17 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-17 | House | Title stricken |
2023-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 2 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Carry Over) 2023-05-23 - Enacting clause restored