OK SB619 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cigarette and tobacco dealers; adding cause to cancel license. Effective date.
Title
Cigarette and tobacco dealers; adding cause to cancel license. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2013 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 12 |
2013-04-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hulbert |
2013-04-03 | House | General Order |
2013-03-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Biggs (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brooks |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |