OK SB617 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB617
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; exempting certain agencies from information technology consolidation. Effective date.
Title
Public finance; exempting certain agencies from information technology consolidation. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB617 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - Enacting clause stricken