OK SB616 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB616
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agritourism; expanding agritourism professionals with limited liability. Effective date.
Title
Agritourism; expanding agritourism professionals with limited liability. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fields |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB616 (Carry Over) 2017-04-04 - CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee