OK SB615 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Licensed Dietitian Act; broadening certain definition; providing penalties for violations. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensed Dietitian Act; broadening certain definition; providing penalties for violations. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 64 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06SenateApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-24SenateSent to Governor
2016-05-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2016-05-24SenateEnrolled, to House
2016-05-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2016-05-24HouseTo Senate
2016-05-24HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 22
2016-05-24HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-20HouseCCR submitted
2016-05-20SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 8
2016-05-20SenateCCR adopted
2016-05-18SenateTitle restored
2016-05-18SenateCCR read
2016-05-18Senateremove as coauthor Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie)
2016-05-18Senatecoauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie)
2016-05-16SenateSCs changed Garrison to Floyd
2016-04-27SenateSCs named Sparks, David, Griffin, Treat, Yen, Garrison, Standridge
2016-04-20HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
2016-04-19SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2016-04-13SenateHAs read
2016-04-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-04-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-04-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 27
2016-04-12HouseGeneral Order
2016-03-30HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Thomsen
2016-03-30HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 16
2015-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-03-09SenateGeneral Order, considered and deferred
2015-03-09SenateBacked up to General Order
2015-03-09SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10
2015-03-04SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Sparks
2015-03-04SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 27
2015-03-04SenateTitle stricken
2015-03-04SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-02-26Senatecoauthored by Echols (principal House author)
2015-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Sparks
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb615&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB615%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB615%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB615%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB615%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB615%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB615%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB615%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB615%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB615%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB615_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB615_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback