OK SB610 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public finance; creating the Opioid Settlement and Judgment Revolving Fund; authorizing appropriation and certain expenses. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public finance; creating the Opioid Settlement and Judgment Revolving Fund; authorizing appropriation and certain expenses. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-10SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee
2021-02-02SenateCoauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb610&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB610%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB610%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB610%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB610%20CA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB610%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB610%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB610%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB610_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback