OK SB6 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; authorizing OSBI clothing allowance. Effective date.
Title
Public safety; authorizing OSBI clothing allowance. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 16 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 25 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Bennett (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Barrington |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |