OK SB597 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Water rights; exceptions; groundwater law. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water rights; exceptions; groundwater law. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 To Senate
2011-05-19 Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2011-05-19 Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby, Wesselhoft, Sherrer, Hoskin
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-18 CCR submitted
2011-05-18 Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2011-05-18 CCR adopted
2011-05-17 CCR read
2011-05-16 Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs
2011-05-16 SCs named Bingman, Branan, Simpson, Brecheen, Paddack, Burrage
2011-05-13 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-05-02 HAs read
2011-05-02 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-27 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-27 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2011-04-27 Enacting clause restored
2011-04-27 Title restored
2011-04-27 Amended
2011-04-27 Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Roberts (Dustin), Hardin, Farley, Moore, Billy
2011-04-27 General Order
2011-04-12 Enacting clause stricken
2011-04-12 Coauthored by Representative(s) Ownbey, Hilliard
2011-04-12 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2011-03-17 Second Reading referred to Judiciary
2011-03-16 First Reading
2011-03-16 Engrossed to House
2011-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-15 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2011-03-15 Title stricken
2011-03-15 coauthored by Fields
2011-03-15 General Order, Amended
2011-03-01 coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author)
2011-03-01 coauthored by Brecheen
2011-03-01 Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Rules
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Bingman
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8210202New CodeSee Bill Text
8210516New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback