OK SB595 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-20 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Highway advertising programs; directing study of alternative highway advertising programs. Noncodification. Emergency.
Title
Highway advertising programs; directing study of alternative highway advertising programs. Noncodification. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Motion expired | |
2011-04-18 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Derby | |
2011-04-18 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 42 | |
2011-04-18 | General Order | |
2011-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-03 | First Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Brinkley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |