OK SB592 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB592
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Documentary tax stamp; increasing certain penalty. Effective date.
Title
Documentary tax stamp; increasing certain penalty. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Howard |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB592 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget