OK SB592 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB592
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-19 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; regulation of motor carriers; transferring divisions from Corporation Commission to the Department of Public Safety.
Title
Motor vehicles; regulation of motor carriers; transferring divisions from Corporation Commission to the Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Allen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB592 (Carry Over) 2017-04-19 - Enacting clause stricken
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 162 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 166 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 169 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 172 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |