OK SB592 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Used Motor Vehicle and parts Commission; license term; deleting BID cards; increasing fees. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Used Motor Vehicle and parts Commission; license term; deleting BID cards; increasing fees. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-21SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21HouseTo Senate
2015-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 13
2015-05-21HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-21HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-21SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
2015-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-20SenateCCR read
2015-05-15HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2015-05-14SenateSCs named Anderson, Newberry, Barrington, Crain, Smalley, Wyrick, Sparks
2015-05-13SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-05-13SenateRescinded adoption of HAs
2015-05-13SenateMotion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2015-05-12SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Pittman
2015-05-11SenateNotice served to reconsider vote on measure Anderson
2015-05-11SenateMeasure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 27
2015-05-11SenateHAs adopted
2015-04-21SenateHAs read
2015-04-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23
2015-04-20HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-09HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2015-03-30HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee sub-committee
2015-03-18HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-10SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-10SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
2015-03-10SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-03-09Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2015-03-04Senatecoauthored by Grau (principal House author)
2015-02-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Anderson
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711371New CodeSee Bill Text
4712506New CodeSee Bill Text
4759110New CodeSee Bill Text
4759111New CodeSee Bill Text
475914New CodeSee Bill Text
475915New CodeSee Bill Text
475919New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb592&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB592%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB592%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB592%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB592%20SUBREC.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB592%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB592%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB592%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB592%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB592%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB592_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB592_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback