OK SB590 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB590
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 35
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 35
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Digital asset mining; establishing the Commercial Digital Asset Mining Act of 2022; providing for certain tax exemptions; proving certain credit. Effective date.
Title
Digital asset mining; establishing the Commercial Digital Asset Mining Act of 2022; providing for certain tax exemptions; proving certain credit. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 35 |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 34 Nays: 10 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Technology |
2022-05-04 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2022-05-03 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 18 |
2022-04-26 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-26 | House | Amended |
2022-04-26 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Technology Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Second Reading referred to Technology |
2022-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative Hilbert and substitute with Representative Martinez |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Montgomery |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB590 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)