OK SB587 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Nursing facilities; permitting use of electronic recording devices in nursing facilities; requiring resident approval. Effective date.
Title
Nursing facilities; permitting use of electronic recording devices in nursing facilities; requiring resident approval. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Long-Term Care and Senior Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House: Long-Term Care and Senior Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/06/2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-29 | Senate | coauthored by Allen |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | coauthored by Morrissette |
2013-04-23 | Senate | coauthored by Hamilton |
2013-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-22 | House | Amended |
2013-04-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2013-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin, Shelton, McDaniel (Jeannie) |
2013-04-22 | House | General Order |
2013-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Coates |
2013-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Long-term Care and Senior Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Long-term Care and Senior Services |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2013-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Fields |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Wright (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Justice |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |