OK SB582 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring submission of certain financial reports to school district boards of education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring submission of certain financial reports to school district boards of education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
2019-02-12SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-12SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Silk
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback