OK SB579 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB579

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

School calendar; removing language allowing school to be in session for certain number of hours. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School calendar; removing language allowing school to be in session for certain number of hours. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Stanislawski
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB579 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Title stricken

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback