OK SB579 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
Pending: House Government Modernization and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ethics Commission rules; requiring certain persons or entities to file quarterly reports. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics Commission rules; requiring certain persons or entities to file quarterly reports. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Modernization
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Murphey (principal House author)
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Sykes
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback