OK SB572 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; prohibiting health regulations from being more stringent than state law; exemptions. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; prohibiting health regulations from being more stringent than state law; exemptions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Brian Crain [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Ron Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-04-29 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-29 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7 | |
2009-04-29 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Considered and deferred | |
2009-04-08 | HAs read | |
2009-04-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-07 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 9 | |
2009-04-07 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby | |
2009-04-07 | General Order | |
2009-04-01 | Title restored | |
2009-04-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2009-04-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5 | |
2009-03-03 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-03 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-02-16 | coauthored by Peters (principal House author) | |
2009-02-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-10 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Peters | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Crain | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |