OK SB560 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB560
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Remove as coauthor Senator Shortey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Remove as coauthor Senator Shortey
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Parent Empowerment, Revenue Enhancement and Classroom Size Reduction Act. Effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the Parent Empowerment, Revenue Enhancement and Classroom Size Reduction Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] |
Sen. Ervin Yen [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Sen. Joe Newhouse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Senator Shortey |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Shortey |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Daniels |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Newhouse |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Loveless |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Yen |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Remove as coauthor Senator Shortey
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 28 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 28 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb560&Session=1700 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB560%20INT.PDF |