OK SB55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB55
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicle license plates; creating Sooner State ABATE special plate; creating specified and designating use of fee. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicle license plates; creating Sooner State ABATE special plate; creating specified and designating use of fee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/25/2017 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-11 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-10 | House | General Order |
2017-04-04 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2017-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Teague (principal House author) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sharp |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB55 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1104 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1135 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |