OK SB549 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State officers; modifying salaries of certain officers. Effective date.
Title
State officers; modifying salaries of certain officers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - House: SHALL THE MEASURE PASS OVER GOVERNOR (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2015-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-20 | House | Veto overridden: Ayes: 80 Nays: 11 |
2015-05-15 | House | Veto override message received |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Veto message read |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Vetoed 05/08/2015 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Title restored |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by McCullough (principal House author) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |