OK SB548 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Judicial officers; modifying procedure for determination of compensation. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judicial officers; modifying procedure for determination of compensation. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 56 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 48 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT TO AMENDMENT (Y: 48 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-05SenateApproved by Governor 06/05/2015
2015-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2015-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2015-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2015-05-22HouseTo Senate
2015-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 28
2015-05-22HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sparks
2015-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2015-05-22SenateCCR adopted, GCCA
2015-05-21SenateCCR read, GCCA
2015-05-18HouseConference granted, naming GCCA
2015-05-15SenateSCs named GCCA
2015-05-15SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2015-04-27SenateHAs read
2015-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 37
2015-04-22HouseAmended
2015-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2015-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading
2015-03-11SenateEngrossed to House
2015-03-11SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-03-11SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2015-03-11SenateTitle restored
2015-03-11SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-03-03Senatecoauthored by Sears (principal House author)
2015-02-25SenateTitle stricken
2015-02-25SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2015-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-02-18SenateWithdrawn from Judiciary committee
2015-02-03SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2015-02-02SenateAuthored by Senator Sykes
2015-02-02SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2031New CodeSee Bill Text
2032New CodeSee Bill Text
2033New CodeSee Bill Text
20302ANew CodeSee Bill Text
20312New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb548&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/SB/SB548%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB548%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/SB548%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/SB/SB548%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/SB548%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB548%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/SB/SB548%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB548_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB548_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback