OK SB538 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB538
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drugs; creating the Oklahoma Right to Know Act; authorizing persons to request certain information on drug pricing. Effective date.
Title
Prescription drugs; creating the Oklahoma Right to Know Act; authorizing persons to request certain information on drug pricing. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Standridge |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB538 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)