OK SB536 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oil and gas; increasing maximum penalty amounts. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas; increasing maximum penalty amounts. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-20SenateApproved by Governor 04/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-14SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-04-13SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-04-13HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-04-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 37
2021-04-13HouseGeneral Order
2021-04-01HouseCR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2021-03-10HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-10SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-09SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-09SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
2021-03-09SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-03SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-02-18SenateReported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Bergstrom
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb536&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB536%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB536%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB536%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB536%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB536%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB536%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/SB536%20INT%20FI.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB536%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/Senate/SB536%20INT%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB536_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB536_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback