OK SB531 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alarm and locksmiths; technology advancements; licenses; references. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alarm and locksmiths; technology advancements; licenses; references. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateApproved by Governor 04/25/2017
2017-04-19SenateSent to Governor
2017-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-19SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-04-18SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-04-18HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0
2017-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-12HouseCR; Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2017-03-20HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-15SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
2017-03-14SenateTitle restored
2017-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-02-23SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed
2017-02-09Senatecoauthored by Faught (principal House author)
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5918002New CodeSee Bill Text
5918004New CodeSee Bill Text
5918005New CodeSee Bill Text
5918006New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback