OK SB529 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Motor vehicles; creating Erin Elizabeth Swezey Act; ignition interlock device penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; creating Erin Elizabeth Swezey Act; ignition interlock device penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-19 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-19 To Senate
2011-05-19 Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
2011-05-19 Coauthored by Representative(s) Grau
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-19 CCR submitted
2011-05-19 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2011-05-19 coauthored by Coates
2011-05-19 CCR adopted
2011-05-19 Considered and deferred
2011-05-17 Title restored
2011-05-17 CCR read
2011-05-09 SCs named Jolley, Barrington, Nichols, Johnson (Rob), Burrage, Garrison
2011-05-09 Conference granted, naming GCCA
2011-05-04 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-05-02 HAs read
2011-05-02 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-27 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-27 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9
2011-04-27 Title stricken
2011-04-27 Amended
2011-04-27 Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott
2011-04-27 General Order
2011-04-14 Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft, Sanders, Bennett
2011-04-14 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2011-03-22 Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
2011-03-22 Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee
2011-03-17 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2011-03-16 First Reading
2011-03-16 Engrossed to House
2011-03-15 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-15 Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2011-03-15 coauthored by Ford
2011-03-15 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2011-03-01 coauthored by Nelson (principal House author)
2011-03-01 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2011-03-01 Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ford
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Public Safety
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Jolley
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711902New CodeSee Bill Text
4711906New CodeSee Bill Text
476111New CodeSee Bill Text
476205New CodeSee Bill Text
476211New CodeSee Bill Text
476212New CodeSee Bill Text
477541New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback