OK SB528 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Bus transportation; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Title
Bus transportation; modifying inclusions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Public Safety Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Wood (principal House author) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Shortey |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 11 | 705 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 12 | 228 | New Code | See Bill Text |