OK SB52 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB52
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driver licenses; requiring certain action. Effective date.
Title
Driver licenses; requiring certain action. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scooter Park [R] | Sen. Jack Fry [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16 |
2017-04-19 | House | General Order |
2017-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Park (principal House author) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Fry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB52 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017