OK SB519 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB519
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; authorizing annual retirement for certain members with service-connected disability.
Title
Oklahoma Law Enforcement Retirement System; authorizing annual retirement for certain members with service-connected disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brecheen |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB519 (Carry Over) 2017-04-04 - Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108