OK SB511 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Native American Cultural and Educational Authority; making Authority a division of the Oklahoma Historical Society. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Native American Cultural and Educational Authority; making Authority a division of the Oklahoma Historical Society. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 14 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 20 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Treat |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1226 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1226 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |