OK SB508 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB508
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Bakery Act of 2013; modifying definition. Effective date.
Title
Home Bakery Act of 2013; modifying definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 24 |
2017-04-17 | House | General Order |
2017-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 8 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Coody (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Dahm |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1440 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1440 | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |